Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Tomás Esteban de Piña y Mazo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1723Born
174723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jul 177955.5AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
14 Jan 178157.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
22 Nov 179571.9DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Luis Tomás Esteban de Piña y Mazo
Bishop Luis Tomás Esteban de Piña y Mazo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAstudillo, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopIsla del Carmen
Death PlaceMérida, Diocese of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 98, Number 504
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 448
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Oct 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,922
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,671
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast