Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Podio

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1447AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
7 May 1447Ordained BishopBishop of Bologna, Italy
13 Dec 1447DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jean de Podio:
Bishop Jean de Podio (died ) Bishop of Bologna

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 108
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,042

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013