Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Antonio Forcilioni, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1446AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
12 Mar 1446Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
2 May 1459DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
26 Nov 1525Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Antonio Forcilioni:
Archbishop St. Antonio Forcilioni O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 154
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013