Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi (Alvise) Cardinal Pisani

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
1555²33.0AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
12 Mar 156543.1Elevated to Cardinal
8 Feb 156644.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
2 Jun 156846.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
3 Jun 157048.4DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi (Alvise) Pisani (VIAF: 316532197)
Luigi (Alvise) Cardinal Pisani (born 1522, died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria delle Grazie, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a cardinal for 5.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018