Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Pimpinella

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1485Born
3 Jul 152540.4AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
13 Aug 152540.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
3 Nov 153449.7DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Pimpinella
Archbishop Vincenzo Pimpinella (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast