Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Piers

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660¹Born
23 Jan 169434.0SelectedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
21 May 169636.3ConfirmedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
26 Mar 173979.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
29 May 173979.4ResignedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Piers
Bishop Richard Piers (born 1660, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdferten, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe
Buried Place (Original)St. Columba, Chapel, Sens, Archdiocese of Sens, France

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 419
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 47
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast