Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Betz (Petz)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1605AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
18 Jul 1605AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
5 Feb 1606Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
25 Nov 1626DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Adam Betz (Petz)
Bishop Adam Betz (Petz) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuxembourg

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 345
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,606, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast