Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles d’Escars de Pérusse

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
13 Mar 156038.1AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
19 Dec 156947.9AppointedBishop of Langres, France
3 Nov 161492.8DiedBishop of Langres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles d’Escars de Pérusse
Bishop Charles d’Escars de Pérusse (born 1522, died ) Bishop of Langres

EventPlace
Death PlaceLangres, Diocese of Langres

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 226, and Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018