Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Charles-Roger de Bauffremont

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529¹Born
16 Dec 156233.9AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
9 May 156334.3Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
24 Sep 159364.7DiedBishop of Troyes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-Charles-Roger de Bauffremont
Bishop Claude-Charles-Roger de Bauffremont (born 1529, died ) Bishop of Troyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSennecey lès Dijon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Troyes, Diocese of Troyes
Death PlaceScey sur Saone

  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1563, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018