Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul Hubert Perny, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kuiceu, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1818Born
15 Apr 184324.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 184628.5ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1853²34.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kuiceu, China
1860²41.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Kuiceu, China
2 Mar 190788.8DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kuiceu, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Hubert Perny
Father Paul Hubert Perny M.E.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kuiceu

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontarlier, Archdiocese of Besançon, France
Death PlaceGarches-lès-Saint-Cloud (Seine-et-Oise)

  • a priest for 63.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast