Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal Pérez Calvillo

Deceased

Administrator of Tarazona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

Note(s): (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1383AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
28 Oct 1388Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
4 Dec 1391AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
22 Sep 1397AppointedAdministrator of Tarazona, Spain
22 Sep 1397Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 1397AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
21 Jul 1404DiedAdministrator of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary
Fernando Pérez Calvillo
Fernando Cardinal Pérez Calvillo
(died )
Administrator of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarazona, Diocese of Tarazona
Death PlaceTarazona, Diocese of Tarazona
Buried Place (Original)San Lorenzo Chapel, Cathedral, Tarazona, Diocese of Tarazona

Relatives
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
  • a cardinal for 6.8 years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 486
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025