Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alonso de Peralta

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1609AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
30 Nov 1609Ordained BishopArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
3 Dec 1614DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Alonso de Peralta:
Archbishop Alonso de Peralta (died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015