Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar de la Peña Avilés

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643²BornColmenar
17 Dec 170360.9AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Feb 170461.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
7 Feb 170562.0DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar de la Peña Avilés:
Bishop Baltasar de la Peña Avilés (died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,577
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 23, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015