Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Parsberg

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1384BornHemau
24 May 143753.4SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
28 Jun 143753.5ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
30 Jun 143753.5Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
28 Feb 145066.2DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Parsberg:
Bishop Friedrich von Parsberg (died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013