Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria (Niccolò) Cardinal Panebianco, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1808Born
1829²20.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 Sep 186153.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 186153.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
23 Dec 186153.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
23 Apr 186354.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
17 Jan 186758.4AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
15 Oct 187769.1ResignedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
30 Mar 188273.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
25 Jan 188374.4ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
21 Nov 188577.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria (Niccolò) Panebianco (VIAF: 304669700)
Antonio Maria (Niccolò) Cardinal Panebianco O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerranova, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 24.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1861

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017