Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matteo de Oviedo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547BornSegovia, Spain
5 May 160053.3AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
16 Jul 160053.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
10 Jan 161063.0DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Matteo de Oviedo:
Archbishop Matteo de Oviedo O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013