Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ortiz de Zárate

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹BornAranda de Duero
14 May 164564.3SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
21 Aug 164564.6ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
30 Nov 164564.9Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
24 Apr 164665.3DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ortiz de Zárate:
Bishop Juan Ortiz de Zárate (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,859
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 175, Number 1,085
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015