Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Orti

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1523AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
28 Jun 1523Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
16 Aug 1535DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Orti
Bishop Gabriel Orti (died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarazona, Diocese of Tarazona
Ordained BishopValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 35, Number 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,523, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast