Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donato Oliverio

Bishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1956 BornCosenza
17 Oct 198226.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 201256.2AppointedBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
1 Jul 201256.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Donato Oliverio:
Bishop Donato Oliverio (born ) Bishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 May 2012
  • ob/c1: CB, 12 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013