Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Conor O’Devany, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1533¹Born
27 Apr 158249.3AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
13 May 158249.3Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
1 Feb 161279.0DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
27 Sep 1992Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Conor O’Devany (VIAF: 14639927)
Bishop Bl. Conor O’Devany O.F.M. (born 1533, died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaphoe, Diocese of Raphoe
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 189
  • bp/ob/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018