Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich von Nu▀dorf (Nussdorfer)

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1440Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 1451SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
4 Nov 1454ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
May 1455³Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
2 Sep 1479DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ulrich von Nu▀dorf (Nussdorfer)
Bishop Ulrich von Nu▀dorf (Nussdorfer) (died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,603
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,455, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast