Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Núñez de Novoa

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 May 1318AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
25 Sep 1319AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
1320²Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
16 May 1332DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Núñez de Novoa
Bishop Gonzalo Núñez de Novoa (died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 19, and Page 314
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 301, Number 141
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,479
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 28 May 2019

Quantcast