Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Newport

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1317SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
15 May 1317Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
24 Aug 1318DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Newport
Bishop Richard Newport (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 71
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 290
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast