Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert of Winchelsey

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Feb 1293SelectedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
4 Sep 1294ConfirmedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
12 Sep 1294Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
11 May 1313DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert of Winchelsey
Archbishop Robert of Winchelsey (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopL’Aquila, Diocese of L’Aquila, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 163
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 68
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 15
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,925

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast