Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Neville

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1432Born
4 Feb 145624.1AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
3 Dec 145826.9Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 146533.2AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
8 Jun 147644.4DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Neville:
Archbishop George Neville (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 17.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,464
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 151, and Page 148
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 111
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013