Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Tarcisio Giovanni Nazzaro, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1933Born
27 Nov 194916.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Aug 195623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jun 199865.4AppointedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
15 Nov 200673.8ResignedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
20 Oct 201885.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tarcisio Giovanni Nazzaro
Abbot Tarcisio Giovanni Nazzaro O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAiello del Sabato

  • a priest for 62.1 years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2006
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • d: CB, 21 Oct 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast