Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Nacchianti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1502Born
30 Jan 154441.2AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
24 Apr 156966.5DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Nacchianti (VIAF: 22480584)
Bishop Giacomo Nacchianti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 170
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Sep 2017