Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Murol

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1340¹Born
8 Sep 137737.6SelectedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
27 Jan 137838.0ConfirmedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
12 Jul 138545.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
12 Jul 138545.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jul 138545.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
24 Jul 138545.5AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
23 Dec 138848.9ResignedAdministrator of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
10 Feb 139959.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Murol
Jean Cardinal de Murol (born 1340, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstaing, Diocese of Clermont, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Franciscans, Chapel, Clermont-Ferrand, Diocese of Clermont, France

  • a cardinal for 13.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1385
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 260, and Page 497

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast