Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionigi Morelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Aug 1605AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
24 Aug 1605Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
13 Oct 1612DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionigi Morelli
Bishop Dionigi Morelli (died ) Bishop of Ferentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 13
  • c2: AT, 12 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017