Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Octaviano Cardinal de’ Monticelli

Deceased

Bishop

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Note/Previous Titular See: (Antipope Victor IV)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1095¹Born
1138²43.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
2 Mar 115156.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
7 Sep 115964.6SelectedBishop
4 Oct 115964.7Ordained BishopBishop
1162²67.0Excommunicated
20 Apr 116469.3DiedBishop

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Octaviano de’ Monticelli (VIAF: 265054718)
Octaviano Cardinal de’ Monticelli (born 1095, died ) Bishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonticelli
Ordained BishopAbbey, Farfa
Death PlaceLucca
Buried Place (Original)S. Ponziano, Monastery, Lucca
Buried Place (Current)Lost

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1138
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast