Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond de Montaigu

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Aug 1329AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
11 Mar 1330Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
17 Jul 1336AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
1 Apr 1340DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond de Montaigu
Bishop Raymond de Montaigu (died ) Bishop of Clermont

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 203, and Page 192
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast