Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard de Montaigu

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Sep 1403AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
24 Jul 1409AppointedBishop of Paris, France
25 Sep 1420DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Gérard de Montaigu
Bishop Gérard de Montaigu (died ) Bishop of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391, and Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jun 2020

Quantcast