Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe de Boisgiloud

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1415AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
12 Jan 1416Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
21 Sep 1418DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Boisgiloud
Bishop Philippe de Boisgiloud (died ) Bishop of Chartres

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 167
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,817

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast