Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Monreal

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542²BornZaragoza
5 Jun 159250.4AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
30 Aug 159250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
14 Feb 159452.1AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
31 Jul 160765.5DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Monreal:
Bishop Diego Monreal (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,494
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214, and Page 264
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 105, Number 662
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 266, and Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015