Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Montalbán Gómez, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1661BornHinojosas de Calatrava
13 Sep 170645.4AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
16 Sep 172059.4AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
12 Nov 172059.5DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Montalbán Gómez:
Bishop Juan Montalbán Gómez O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 26, Number 50
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 214, and Page 316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015