Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Laso de la Vega Córdova, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1662BornGranada
5 Oct 171654.4AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
Dec 1716³54.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
28 May 172159.1AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
14 Jul 173876.2DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Laso de la Vega Córdova:
Bishop Francisco Laso de la Vega Córdova O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 316, and Page 354
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,516

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013