Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Millini (Mellini)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1677Born
10 Apr 174770.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 174770.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
1 Apr 174871.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
25 Jul 175679.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary
Mario Millini (Mellini)
Mario Cardinal Millini (Mellini)
(born , died )
Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Relatives
  • a cardinal for 9.2 years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025