Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Metzler von Andelberg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490Born
2 Jul 154858.5SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
20 Mar 154959.2ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
Jul 1549³59.5Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
11 Sep 156171.6DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph Metzler von Andelberg (VIAF: 13072174)
Bishop Christoph Metzler von Andelberg (born 1490, died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeldkirch
Ordained BishopAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg
Death PlaceMeersburg

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018