Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Menthony

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Aug 1394AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
23 Aug 1394Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
8 Jul 1406DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Menthony:
Bishop Guillaume de Menthony (died ) Bishop of Lausanne

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 297
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,987

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013