Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal Brancaccio

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1340¹BornNapoli
12 Apr 136727.3AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
13 Jan 137737.0AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
18 Dec 137839.0Elevated to Cardinal
1379¹39.0ResignedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
24 Feb 137939.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
Apr 1388³48.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
29 Jun 141272.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Brancaccio:
Cardinal Niccolò Brancaccio (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a cardinal for 33.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 128, and Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013