Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Mendigaño Armendáriz

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1674³Born
8 Apr 172651.8AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
30 Oct 172854.4DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Mendigaño Armendáriz
Archbishop Francisco Mendigaño Armendáriz (born , died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAstrain, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 44, Number 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,726, Number 55
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast