Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Melun

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Sep 1474AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
5 Mar 1475Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
13 May 1483DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Melun
Bishop Louis de Melun (died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 189
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1475, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast