Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Martínez de Villatoriel

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1586AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
2 Sep 1586Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
12 Sep 1591DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Martínez de Villatoriel
Bishop Juan Martínez de Villatoriel (died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón, Diocese of León
Ordained BishopSan Martin, Church, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 98, Number 612
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast