Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Mas

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornTarragona
23 Feb 167472.1SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
10 Sep 167472.6ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
4 Mar 168482.1DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Mas:
Bishop Jaime Mas (born 1602, died ) Bishop of Vic

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,151
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 212, Number 1,321
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015