Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Mascarenhas, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571²Born
15 Feb 162150.1AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
16 Apr 162352.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
13 Oct 162453.7DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Mascarenhas
Bishop Simon Mascarenhas O.F.M. (born 1571, died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcacovas, Portugal

  • a bishop for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,781
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 160
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018