Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasco Martins

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1328AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
9 Mar 1329Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
25 Sep 1342AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
18 Nov 1344DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Vasco Martins
Bishop Vasco Martins (died ) Bishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,828
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,906

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast