Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Manrique de Lara, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹Born
12 Feb 160148.1AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
8 Apr 161158.2AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
7 Jun 161562.4DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Manrique de Lara
Archbishop Pedro Manrique de Lara O.S.A. (born 1553, died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaples, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 174
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 116, Number 737
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast