Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503²BornNájera
29 Mar 154239.2AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
21 May 154239.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
24 Apr 155653.3AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
26 Jun 156057.5AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
11 Nov 156057.9DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Manrique de Lara:
Bishop Francisco Manrique de Lara (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 54, Number 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 289
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013