Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Salvator Giuseppe Mammeli

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Alghero, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1737Born
23 Mar 176527.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 179961.8SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
11 Aug 180063.2ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
26 Feb 180163.7DiedBishop-Elect of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvator Giuseppe Mammeli
Father Salvator Giuseppe Mammeli (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Alghero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 67
  • b: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018