Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andreas Maria de Maistre

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Aosta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1757BornChambery
13 Dec 181760.5SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
16 Mar 181860.8ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
18 Jul 181861.1DiedBishop-Elect of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andreas Maria de Maistre:
Priest Andreas Maria de Maistre (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Aosta

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013